California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00480
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Kern, BCV-25-101007
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 11:06 AM PDT
Defendant
5245 Western Refining Retail, LLC
Defendant
Speedway LLC
Defendant
Western Refining Retail, LLC
Represented By
Julie Rae Trotter
Call Jensen And Ferrell
contact info
Mireya Anne Rosa Llaurado
Call & Jensen
contact info
Mia Angelina Lomedico
Call & Jensen
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnathon Peoples
Represented By
Arby Aiwazian
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/12 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Johnathon Peoples. (Shaw, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 4:02 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Brittany Lyn Shaw on behalf of Johnathon Peoples. Attorney Shaw, Brittany Lyn added. (Shaw, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 05/05 4:28 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Western Refining Retail LLC re2 Civil New Case Documents,. (Lomedico, Mia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 04/28 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Western Refining Retail, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,. (Lomedico, Mia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Mon 04/28 9:50 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2025 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CDB Worksheet,
Att: 2 Standing Order,
Att: 3 Consent Form,
Att: 4 VDRP
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Kern, case number BCV-25-101007 by Johnathon Peoples.(Lomedico, Mia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of M. Lomedico,
Att: 3 Declaration of S. Hager,
Att: 4 Declaration of J. Motta,
Att: 5 Notice of Interested Parties
misc Receipt Mon 04/28 8:05 AM
RECEIPT number ACAEDC-12183128 for $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Mia Angelina Lomedico. (Deputy Clerk JPX)
Related: [-]