Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Mary S Mcelroy
Referred: Lincoln D Almond
Case #: 1:25-cv-03013
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:06 PM EDT
Defendant
CVS Caremark Corporation
Represented By
Jonathan S Tam
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton And Garrison LLP
contact info
Jacqueline P. Rubin
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Kimberly O Branscome
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton And Garrison LLP
contact info
Natalie Marie Pita
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Defendant
GoodRX Inc.
Represented By
David Ramraj Singh
Weil Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
GoodRx Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
David Ramraj Singh
Weil Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
Medimpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff
Esco Drug Co.
Represented By
JooYun Kim
Hgt Law
contact info
Hung G. Ta
Hgt Law
contact info
Peter G Safirstein
Safirstein Law LLC
contact info
Alexander Humphrey Hu
Hgt Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 04/28 1:27 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:24-cv-10543. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a)
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Transferred Mon 04/28 2:11 PM
MDL Member Case Transferred from the Central District of California, Case Number 2:24-cv-10543. Case Related to MDL No. 3148. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 2:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:25-md-3148-MSM-LDA (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. This civil action is now associated as a related case. Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), an attorney may appear and practice in the District of Rhode Island in connection with the transferred matter and the related MDL master docket. Counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of Rhode Island via[LINK:PACER] if not previously done so. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3148, transferring case to USDC, Rhode Island and assigned to Honorable Mary S. McElroy. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance22 , Notice of Appearance23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
28 28 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting26 Non-Resident Attorney Natalie M. Pita APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CVS Caremark Corp., designating Jonathan S. Tam as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting25 Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline P. Rubin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CVS Caremark Corp., designating Jonathan S. Tam as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Natalie M. Pita to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CVS Caremark Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39068765) filed by Defendant CVS Caremark Corp.. (Tam, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 NC-Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 NY-Certificate of Good Standing
25 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline P. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CVS Caremark Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39068726) filed by Defendant CVS Caremark Corp.. (Tam, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
24 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVS Caremark Corp., identifying None. (Branscome, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan S Tam on behalf of Defendant CVS Caremark Corp. (Attorney Jonathan S Tam added to party CVS Caremark Corp.(pty:dft))(Tam, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kimberly O Branscome on behalf of Defendant CVS Caremark Corp. (Attorney Kimberly O Branscome added to party CVS Caremark Corp.(pty:dft))(Branscome, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
21 21 2 pgs ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT18 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond in the Action is extended until forty-five (45) days after the later of: (i) the date upon which plaintiffs in the Related Actions have filed a consolidated complaint in any district or (ii) the date upon which the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules upon the Second Motion to Transfer. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant GoodRx Holdings, Inc., identifying GoodRx, Inc.; Silver Lake LLC; Francisco Partners Management, LP; and Idea Men LLC. (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant GoodRx Inc., identifying GoodRx Holdings, Inc.; Silver Lake LLC; Francisco Partners Management, LP; and Idea Men LLC. (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 8 pgs Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants GoodRx Inc., GoodRx Holdings, Inc..(Singh, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Ramraj Singh counsel for Defendants GoodRx Inc., GoodRx Holdings, Inc.. Adding David R. Singh as counsel of record for GoodRX, Inc. and GoodRX Holdings, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants GoodRX, Inc. and GoodRX Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney David Ramraj Singh added to party GoodRx Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Ramraj Singh added to party GoodRx Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Singh, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
16 16 Mail Returned addressed to Alexander Hu re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18)5 . (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
15 15 19 pgs STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
14 14 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney JooYun Kim APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Esco Drug Co., designating Hung G. Ta as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Peter Safirstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Esco Drug Co., designating Hung G. Ta as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
12 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:24-cv-09379 SPG(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Hernan D. Vera to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-10543 SPG(SKx). Signed by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett (rn)
Related: [-]
11 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JooYun Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Esco Drug Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38750479) filed by Plaintiff Esco Drug Co.. (Ta, Hung)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter Safirstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Esco Drug Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38750414) filed by Plaintiff Esco Drug Co.. (Ta, Hung)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-10543 HDV(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
8 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter Safirstein on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
4 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Esco Drug Co.. Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-9379 and 2:24-cv-9490 (Ta, Hung)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Esco Drug Co., (Ta, Hung)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Esco Drug Co.. (Ta, Hung)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38712283 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Esco Drug Co.. (Attorney Hung G. Ta added to party Esco Drug Co.(pty:pla))(Ta, Hung)
Related: [-]