Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:25-cv-00724
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Loudoun County Circuit Court, 25-02093
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Quinn Adams
O'Hagan Meyer Pllc (richmond)
contact info
Maxfield Benning Daley-Watson
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Defendant
Ryder Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC
Defendant
Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.
Plaintiff
Fabra Group


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/23 1:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Nader, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/23 1:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Nader, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/23 1:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Systems, Inc.. (Nader, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/23 1:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Ryder Systems, Inc., Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc..(Nader, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/19 10:59 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc.. (Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/12 6:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam James Bacon on behalf of Fabra Group (Bacon, Adam)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Opposition Mon 05/12 6:33 PM
Opposition to2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fabra Group. (Bacon, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/06 11:47 AM
ORDERED that the Motion8 is GRANTED. Defendants Ryder System, Inc., Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., and Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC (collectively, the "Ryder Defendants") shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than May 23, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 05/06/2025. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 misc Waiver of Mon 05/05 3:39 PM
Waiver of re8 Consent MOTION for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (waiver of return date and motions haring) by Ryder Systems, Inc., Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Nader, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Mon 05/05 3:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ryder Systems, Inc., Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc..(Nader, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - email exchange,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Hearing Date Tue 04/29 1:07 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for June 13, 2025 at 10:00 am re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Tue 04/29 10:55 AM
Letter from Clerk regarding Local Rule 83.1.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 10:45 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc.. (Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 04/29 9:23 AM
Notice of Correction re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 3:33 PM
Set Deadline as to2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (triv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maxfield Benning Daley-Watson on behalf of Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc. (Daley-Watson, Maxfield)
Related: [-]
3 3 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 04/28 1:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc.. (Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/28 1:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc.. (Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 1:35 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10147338.), filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Ryder Systems, Inc., Mil-Tek, USA Recycling and Waste Solutions, Inc., Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC.(Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/29 9:15 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm)
Related: [-]