Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:25-bk-80447

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 5:25-ap-80074
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Redstone Federal Credit Union
220 Wynn Drive
Huntsville, AL 35893
Represented By
Redstone Federal Credit Union
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommie Lee Scott, Jr.
158 Fox Chase Trail
Toney, AL 35773
Represented By
G. John Dezenberg, Jr.
Dezenberg & Smith, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/02 3:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Redstone Federal Credit Union 5/2/2025 (Dezenberg, G.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/28 3:12 PM
Summons Issued Redstone Federal Credit Union Date Issued 4/28/2025, Answer Due 5/28/2025 (mmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 9:30 AM
Adversary case 25-80074 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Complaint by Tommie Lee Scott Jr. against Redstone Federal Credit Union. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Dezenberg, G.)
Related: [-]