Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Fernando J Gaitan, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-00298
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Ray County, Missouri, 25RY-CV00144
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:05 PM CDT
Defendant
Ray County, Missouri
Represented By
Steven F. Coronado
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacalyn Moss
Plaintiff
Stephanie Moss


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/02 9:52 AM
Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (Grube, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 04/28 2:50 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 6/2/2025. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/16/2025. Signed on 4/28/25 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of MAPN Mon 04/28 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Mon 04/28 12:11 PM
NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiffs' counsel by Ray County, Missouri (Coronado, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Ray County, case number 25RY-CV00144, filed by Steven F. Coronado. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9552013.(Coronado, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Circuit Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet