Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:25-cv-60814
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty - Seaman Complaint
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:17th Judicial Circuit Court, CACE-24-006218
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:05 PM EDT
Defendant
THE MOTOR YACHT HAPPY
Plaintiff
Vannessa Lucier
Represented By
Joseph J. Rinaldi, Jr.
Brill & Rinaldi
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
10 10 order Clerk's Notice on Seaman's Fees Thu 05/01 11:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE ON SEAMAN'S CASE Directing Payment of $405.00 Filing Fees upon termination of case. (vjk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian Wed 04/30 12:10 PM
ORDER: GRANTING8 MOTION TO APPOINT CUSTODIAN. National Maritime Services, Inc. appointed. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 motion Appoint Custodian Tue 04/29 2:10 PM
MOTION to Appoint National Maritime Services, Inc. as Custodian by Vannessa R. Lucier. Responses due by 5/13/2025.(Rinaldi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent and Indenmnification Agreement for the Appointment of Substitute Custodian,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 service Warrant In Rem Issued Tue 04/29 11:13 AM
Warrant In Rem Issued as to The Motor Yacht Happy. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM by Vannessa R. Lucier re 5 Order to Show Cause (Rinaldi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Warrant for Arrest in Rem
5 5 order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/28 5:51 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER re:4 Order granting Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Plaintiff must file a proposed Warrant for Arrest in Rem as soon as possible for the Clerk of Court to issue. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz (dsf)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency Mon 04/28 4:55 PM
ORDER granting3 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz See attached document for full details. (dsf)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency Mon 04/28 4:19 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Vannessa R. Lucier. Responses due by 5/12/2025.(Rinaldi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/28 4:11 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint RE: Seaman Mon 04/28 3:37 PM
Complaint RE: Seaman (Verified) IN REM TO ENFORCE MARITIME LIEN AND ARREST VESSEL PURSUANT TO STATE COURT JUDGMENT against THE MOTOR YACHT HAPPY. CLERKS NOTICE: Please be advised that this Seamans Action filed pursuant to 28 USC 1916 defers prepayment of the filing fee until the termination of the case, filed by Vannessa Lucier.(Rinaldi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Defaults,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Verdict,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Final Judgment,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet