Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Case #: 1:25-cv-21927
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 04/29 10:20 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case (Without Prejudice). Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 order Judge Assignment Mon 04/28 4:05 PM
Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (kma)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 04/28 4:00 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 (not paid/ IFP Motion not filed), filed by Horacio Valdes.(kma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for a Writ of H. C.,
Att: 2 Exhibit List