Maryland District Court
Judge:George Levi Russell, III
Case #: 8:25-cv-01350
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Mark Barnart
Defendant
Glenarden Hills Apts
Plaintiff
LaTonya Fletcher
3190 Roland Kenner Loop Apt G
Lanham, MD 20706
Plaintiff
ArKisha Wise
8440 Decatar Trotter Pl Apt D
Lanham, MD 20706


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
10 10 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/01 11:29 AM
ORDER Dismissing without prejudice1 Complaint; Granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/1/2025. (c/m 5/1/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 misc Supplement Wed 04/30 10:37 AM
Supplement to1 Complaint filed by LaTonya Fletcher, ArKisha Wise(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
8 8 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 10:24 AM
ORDER Consolidating Cases (GLR 25-cv-1351). Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/30/2025. (c/m 4/30/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 misc New Case Notification Letter Mon 04/28 3:43 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to ArKisha Wise. (c/m 4/28/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc New Case Notification Letter Mon 04/28 3:41 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to LaTonya Fletcher. (c/m 4/28/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Mon 04/28 3:39 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by ArKisha Wise. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Mon 04/28 3:38 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by LaTonya Fletcher. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 3:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ArKisha Wise(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 3:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaTonya Fletcher(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Mark Barnart, Glenarden Hills Apts, filed by LaTonya Fletcher, ArKisha Wise.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons