Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Samuel J Horovitz
Case #: 3:25-cv-00462
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, IN AND FOR DUVAL COUNTY, 16-02025-CA-001627
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:06 PM EDT
Defendant
BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Jacob Goldberg
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Ramko Jacksonville, LLC
Plaintiff
Sandrine Cales


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/30 4:47 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joseph Goldberg of Local Rule 1.06(b), which requires a legible copy of each paper docketed in the state court. File the complete state court record using the Notice (Other) event. The state court record must be attached as separate files. Refer to the Attorney Civil Case Opening Manual (www.flmd.uscourts.gov), for details on how to attach and describe the state court record (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MGB)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/30 3:54 PM
NOTICE of hearing at 3:00 PM on Wednesday, May 7, 2025, on1 Defendant BJ's Wholesale Club's Notice of Removal. The hearing will be held by video teleconferencing using Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately send participants an Outlook invitation with the information required to join. See Notice for details. (EJK)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/30 11:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL John Marcus of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JVC)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/30 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/29 10:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL John Marcus of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 10:53 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz. New case number: 3:25-cv-462-MMH-SJH. (EVK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Ramco Jacksonville, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Sandrine Cales. (Filed in State Court on 03/20/2025)(MGB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 5:05 PM
NOTICE by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL DEFENDANT'S, BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Clerk of Court, case number 16-2025-CA-001627 filed in State Court on 03/19/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23296577 filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc..(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Return of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Record,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2025 Foreign Profit Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2025 Annual Report