Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00205
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Whitley Circuit Court, 92C01-2503-CT-274
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Does 1-3
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By
Robert T Keen, Jr
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Claims Services Inc
Represented By
Robert T Keen, Jr
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Inc
Represented By
Robert T Keen, Jr
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Wagoner-Swartz


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 misc Statement Mon 05/05 1:11 PM
STATEMENT Pl's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement . (Dahm, Albert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 05/02 11:11 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 05/02 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/30 1:44 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Plaintiff is ordered to file her FRCP 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement on or before 5/7/2025. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/29 12:15 PM
**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 notice Notice - Other Mon 04/28 4:28 PM
NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc re1 Notice of Removal, of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet (Keen, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 2:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc. (Keen, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc (Keen, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5888807.) from Whitley Circuit Court, Cause No. 92C01-2503-CT-000274, filed by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc.(Keen, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summonses,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - State Court filings
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 6 pgs cmp State Court Complaint Tue 04/29 12:17 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-3, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, filed by Erica Wagoner-Swartz. Complaint filed in the Whitley Circuit Court, Case no. 92C01-2503-CT-274. (Attachment: #1 Jury Demand). (nhc)
Related: [-]