Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:25-cv-01356
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Turquoise Austin
Represented By
Thomas A. Pacheco
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Keith Connor
Represented By
Thomas A. Pacheco
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 10:36 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 12:13 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11938954.), filed by Keith Connor, Turquoise Austin.(Pacheco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons