Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Christopher A Boyko
Case #: 1:25-cv-00843
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, CV 25 114381
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Integon General Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Robert R. Terbrack, Jr.
Mcneal, Schick, Archibald & Biro
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Namy
Represented By
Jodi D. Spencer
J Spencer Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 04/29 9:59 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Integon General Insurance Corporation answer due 5/26/2025. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/29/2025.(L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 04/28 4:41 PM
First Motion for extension of time until May 26, 2025 to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Integon General Insurance Corporation. (Terbrack, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 04/28 3:42 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 04/28 3:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent National General Management Corp., Corporate Parent National General Holdings Corp. for Integon General Insurance Corporation filed by Integon General Insurance Corporation. (Terbrack, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 2:59 PM
Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga Common Pleas, case number CV 25 114381 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number AOHNDC-13071558. Filed by Integon General Insurance Corporation. (Terbrack, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint from State Court,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 04/28 3:07 PM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 3:18 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]