Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Case #: 2:25-cv-00092
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/29 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Juan Antonio Baca must address the following deficiency: See Order. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 35 days. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 4/29/2025) (ars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended 2255 form
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/29 3:50 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Apr 29 15:50:37 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 11 pgs mot2255 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 Mon 04/28 4:16 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 2:20-CR-123) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order to Sever
1 1 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 04/28 4:12 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (nht)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/28 4:18 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1. (Copy of 1st page of "Motion" also mailed to Petitioner) Mon Apr 28 16:18:27 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]