Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Case #: 3:25-cv-00671
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 6:04 PM EDT
Defendant
POWERSCHOOL HOLDINGS, INC.
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHNIELLE DWYER
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY HALL
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA KRANTZ
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ERICA LATON
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTIN LOGAN
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRITTANY MANSI
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RACHEL PARADISO
Represented By
Ian Wise Sloss
Silver Golub & Teitell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/29 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *PowerSchool Holdings, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ian Wise Sloss* *Silver Golub & Teitell LLP* *One Landmark Square, 15th Floor* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 04/29 10:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Standing Protective Order,1 Complaint, filed by Erica Laton, Johnielle Dwyer, Brittany Mansi, Kristin Logan, Mary Hall, Christopher Andrews, Racheal Paradiso, Maria Krantz, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 04/29 10:24 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 04/29 10:22 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/28/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 04/29 10:22 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/28/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 04/29 10:21 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2025 Discovery due by 10/28/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2025 Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 7:17 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2025.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT against POWERSCHOOL HOLDINGS, INC. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8150458.), filed by KRISTIN LOGAN, ERICA LATON, MARY HALL, CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS, JOHNIELLE DWYER, RACHEL PARADISO, MARIA KRANTZ, BRITTANY MANSI.(Sloss, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET
service Request to Issue Summons Mon 04/28 5:58 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to POWERSCHOOL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Sloss, Ian)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Tue 04/29 10:18 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Victor A. Bolden assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]