Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 2:25-cv-00568
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:14th JDC, Calcasieu Parish, 24-05347 "D"
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:05 PM CDT
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Philip Andre' Fontenot
Davidson Meaux Et Al
contact info
Jami Lacour Ishee
Davidson Meaux Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Clara Simien
Represented By
Roy Fredric Wygant
Cox Cox Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 4:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Other Affiliate The Seiyu Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LP for Walmart Inc. (aty,Fontenot, Philip)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 4:53 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (aty,Fontenot, Philip)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Removal Order Tue 04/29 1:07 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/29/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 04/28 5:00 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 04/28 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of Walmart Inc AND to Roy Fredric Wygant on behalf of Clara Simien. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/12/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 04/28 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/12/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2024-5347 "D" with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6256574) filed by Walmart Inc..(Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 State court petition,
Att: 3 State court return of service,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Petition - Citation - SOP,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - State Court Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Medical Records of plaintiff,
Att: 7 State court notice of filing,
Att: 8 Civil cover sheet
answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 4:47 PM
STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (14th JDC, Calcasieu Parish, #2024-5347, filed 1/24/2025) by Walmart Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #5 to Document #1, Notice of Removal.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/28 4:51 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]