New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 7:25-cv-03505
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332ni Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 6:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Highbury Concrete, Inc.
1 Blue Hill Plaza 11th floor
Pearl River, NY 10965
Plaintiff
FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A.
727 North Bank Lane
Lake Forest, IL 27589


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 5:20 PM
AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A., Corporate Parent Wintrust Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc for First Insurance Funding. Document filed by First Insurance Funding..(Perrell, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 1:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Highbury Concrete, Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 9:55 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A., Corporate Parent Wintrust Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A.. Document filed by FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A...(Schnitzer, Edward) Modified on 4/29/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 9:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Edward Lee Schnitzer to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 04/29 1:18 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward Lee Schnitzer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 04/29 1:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Lee Schnitzer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $3,347,046,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 3,347,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/29 1:30 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/29 1:31 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/29 1:32 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 5:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Edward Lee Schnitzer to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Attorney who signed the PDF is not the Attorney who electronically file the Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/28 6:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Highbury Concrete, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A...(Schnitzer, Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 6:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A...(Schnitzer, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/28 6:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schnitzer, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 6:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Highbury Concrete, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30997307)Document filed by FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING, a Division of Lake Forest Bank &Trust Company, N.A...(Schnitzer, Edward)
Related: [-]