Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00476
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Menages, Inc.
Plaintiff
Najome Colon
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Cozzens
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Gray
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Hinton
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Brooke Johnson
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanna Krupa
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamie Middleton
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Lucy Pinder
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Lina Posada
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Plaintiff
Megan Vogt
Represented By
Aaron Davis Armstrong
Law Offices Of Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info
Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr.
Bednarz & Bednarz
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 3:07 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/30/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 04/28 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/8/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 04/28 4:37 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 04/28 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 04/28 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Menages, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4310794), filed by Brooke Johnson, Tiffany Gray, Jessica Hinton, Jamie Middleton, Kimberly Cozzens, Joanna Krupa, Megan Vogt, Najome Colon, Lina Posada, Lucy Pinder.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-J Krupa,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 04/28 4:41 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph Paul Bednarz, Jr, Aaron Davis Armstrong admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]