Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00478
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Mill Creek Wealth Management Partners, Inc.
Plaintiff
Margaret Angelia Whitlock
Represented By
N. Chase Teeples
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Melody Fowler-Green
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info
John Stephen Aymett, Jr.
Rucker, Rucker & Aymett, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 12:34 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Margaret Angelia Whitlock. Mill Creek Wealth Management Partners, Inc. served on 4/30/2025.(Teeples, N.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Emails Showing Agreement
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 04/28 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2025 at 04:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (sb)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 4:05 PM
Summons issued as to Mill Creek Wealth Management Partners, Inc. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 04/28 4:03 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 04/28 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 04/28 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Mill Creek Wealth Management Partners, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4310932), filed by Margaret Angelia Whitlock.(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 04/28 4:08 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Melody Fowler-Green, N. Chase Teeples, John Stephen Aymett, Jr admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]