Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-10855
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Epic Smokehouse LLC
1330 S Fern St Ste 3
Arlington, VA 22202-2862
Represented By
Daniel M. Press
Chung & Press, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Matthew W. Cheney
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 1725 Duke Street Suite 650
Alexandria, VA 22314


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 9:35 AM
Scheduling Order. Related [+] Status Conference scheduled 6/17/2025 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Epic Smokehouse LLC
10 10 court 3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency Wed 04/30 8:55 AM
LBR 3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 7/28/2025. Hearing scheduled for 7/29/2025 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Forms Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/30 8:49 AM
Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341 meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Alexandria division (11): Office of the U.S. Trustee, Telephonic meeting - see notice for details. Proof of Claims due by 7/7/2025. Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability of Debt due by 7/28/2025. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 trustee Appointment of Trustee Tue 04/29 3:52 PM
Appointment of Trustee Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee - Lawrence A. KatzFiled by Jack Frankel of Office of the U.S. Trustee on behalf of Matthew W. Cheney (Frankel, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
7 7 court Hearing Cancelled Tue 04/29 3:50 PM
Hearing Cancelled Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s) 6 3016-1 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
6 6 court 3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency Tue 04/29 3:26 PM
LBR 3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 7/28/2025. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 court 1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency Tue 04/29 3:11 PM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2025. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/28 6:08 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Daniel M. Press of Chung & Press, P.C. on behalf of Epic Smokehouse LLC. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 8 pgs motion Employ Mon 04/28 6:02 PM
Application to Employ Daniel M Press and Chung & Press P.C. as Attorneys for Debtor filed by Daniel M. Press of Chung & Press, P.C. on behalf of Epic Smokehouse LLC. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 04/28 5:58 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 25-10855 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A37090531, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 14 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Mon 04/28 5:57 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Daniel M. Press of Chung & Press, P.C. on behalf of Epic Smokehouse LLC. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Tax Return
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Balance Sheet
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Cash Flow
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Statemenr of Operations
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Resolution