Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:25-bk-10839
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC
PO Box 1000
Madisonville, LA 70447-1000
Represented By
Douglas S. Draper
Heller, Draper & Horn L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
DOJ-Ust 600 S. Maestri Place Suite 840-T
New Orleans, LA 70130


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Glenn K. Schreiber on behalf of U.S. Small Business Administration. (Schreiber, Glenn)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/01 2:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael E. Landis on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC. (Landis, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Withdrawal of Document (Do not use for Withdrawal of Claim, Motion or Objection) Thu 05/01 2:24 PM
Withdrawal of Document Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)26 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC) (Landis, Michael
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/01 2:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael E. Landis on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC. (Landis, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 2:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)24 Interim Order) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix Redacted) (Draper, Douglas
24 24 order Interim Order (Sua Sponte) (Order) Thu 05/01 12:00 PM
Interim Order Signed on May 1, 2025 Related [+] (Sylvester, Kenisha)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,16 Objection filed by Creditor B1 Bank
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Evergreen Working Capital, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)19 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Evergreen Working Capital, LLC) (Murray, Cameron
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 10:14 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)15 Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Draper, Douglas
21 21 court Notice of Deficiency Thu 05/01 9:06 AM
Notice of Deficiency Certificate of Service must include the names and addresses of parties to be served. See Standing Order 2006-4 and Local Rule 2002-1. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)19 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Evergreen Working Capital, LLC) Deficiency Correction due by 5/5/2025. (Sylvester, Kenisha
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Coleman Torrans on behalf of B1 Bank. (Torrans, Coleman)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 1:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Cameron Murray on behalf of Evergreen Working Capital, LLC. (Murray, Cameron)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Extend Time to File Schedules (Order) Wed 04/30 12:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on April 30, 2025. Schedules A-J due 5/28/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/28/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/28/2025. (Sylvester, Kenisha)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,15 Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 11:57 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by B1 Bank Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)16 Objection filed by Creditor B1 Bank) (Kadden, Benjamin
16 16 answer Objection Wed 04/30 11:51 AM
Objection with Certificate of Service b1 Banks Limited Objection to Debtors Expedited Motion for Interim Order Approving Post-Petition Factoring Agreement Filed by B1 Bank Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC) Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2025 at 05:00 PM by *SECTION A TeleConference Line: 1-504-517-1385 Access Code 129611. (Kadden, Benjamin
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 motion 02Extend Time to File Schedules Tue 04/29 3:31 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Douglas S. Draper of Heller, Draper & Horn L.L.C. on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 2:06 PM
Certificate of Service United States Trustee's Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Filed by Office of the U.S. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee) (Bergeron, Christy
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/29 1:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Yadira Crespo-Orosco on behalf of Evergreen Working Capital, LLC. (Crespo-Orosco, Yadira)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,4 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,6 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,7 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,8 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix Redacted) (Brouphy, Greta
11 11 order 120 day order Tue 04/29 10:57 AM
120 day order Signed on April 29, 2025 (Sylvester, Kenisha)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/29 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brett P. Furr on behalf of Evergreen Working Capital, LLC. (Furr, Brett)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/29 9:44 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christy Renee Bergeron on behalf of Office of the U.S. Trustee. (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 order Expedite Hearing (Order) Mon 04/28 7:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing on First Day Motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall IMMEDIATELY serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on April 28, 2025. Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2025 at 05:00 PM by *SECTION A TeleConference Line: 1-504-517-1385 Access Code 129611. (Villneurve, L)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,4 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,6 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC
7 7 motion Expedite Hearing Mon 04/28 5:39 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing on First Day Motions Related [+] Filed by Douglas S. Draper of Heller, Draper & Horn L.L.C. on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,4 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC,6 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC
6 6 motion zGeneric Motion Mon 04/28 5:32 PM
Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Reimbursable Expenses and (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Douglas S. Draper of Heller, Draper & Horn L.L.C. on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit (PF) Mon 04/28 5:27 PM
Affidavit Re: Creditor Verification Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC) (Draper, Douglas
4 4 motion zGeneric Motion Mon 04/28 5:25 PM
Expedited Motion for Entry of a Final Order (I)Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Continue to Operate its Cash Management System, and (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Douglas S. Draper of Heller, Draper & Horn L.L.C. on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Use Cash Collateral Mon 04/28 5:18 PM
Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral for Interim Order Approving Post Petition Factoring Agreement Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral & Granting Security Interests and Super Priority Administrative Expense Treatment Filed by Douglas S. Draper of Heller, Draper & Horn L.L.C. on behalf of Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
2 2 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Mon 04/28 4:56 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors of Edward W Davis in Support of Emergency First Day Motions Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
1 1 17 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/28 4:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Axis Oilfield Rentals LLC. Schedule A/B due 05/12/2025. Schedule D due 05/12/2025. Schedule E/F due 05/12/2025. Schedule G due 05/12/2025. Schedule H due 05/12/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/12/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/12/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/12/2025. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/26/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 08/26/2025. (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/28 4:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10839 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A8521926, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1