California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:25-bk-11107
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Cash Money LLC
1100 S Raymond Ave Ste A
Fullerton, CA 92831-5247
Represented By
Quintin G Shammam
Law Offices Of Quintin G Shammam
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Queenie K Ng
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Cash Money LLC
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Cash Money LLC
4 4 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Wed 04/30 1:51 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee and Acceptance of Subchapter V Trustee . Mark M Sharf (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Ng, Queenie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 04/28 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by TS. Receipt Number 81001032. (admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/28 4:12 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor Cash Money LLC. (TS)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/28 4:06 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Cash Money LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 5/12/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 5/12/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/12/2025. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 5/12/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 5/12/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 7/28/2025. (TS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Third party filer ID