California Eastern District Court
Judge:Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00483
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
City of McFarland
Defendant
McFarland Police Department
Plaintiff
Cordero Anthony Marin
1800 Q Street Apt. 404
Bakersfield, CA 93302


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/29 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 04/29/2025. (Deputy Clerk CRB)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 04/29 3:25 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Cordero Anthony Martin. (Deputy Clerk CRB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 2:36 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cordero Anthony Marin. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against City of McFarland, McFarland Police Department by Cordero Anthony Marin. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Mon 04/28 2:42 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]