California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:25-cv-03696
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 25CV113652
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Associatiopn
Represented By
Garrick Vanderfin
Polsinelli LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deneen Allmond


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 04/29 11:25 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 04/29 11:01 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/29 10:30 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by U.S. Bank National Associatiopn . (Vanderfin, Garrick)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/29 8:08 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use December 2024 form which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/ No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetPlease re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by U.S. Bank National Associatiopn (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 04/28 5:04 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by U.S. Bank National Associatiopn identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Associatiopn. re1 Notice of Removal, (Vanderfin, Garrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 25CV113652. (). Filed by U.S. Bank National Associatiopn.(Vanderfin, Garrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet