Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet E Bostwick
Case #: 1:25-bk-10844
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 03, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jul 07, 2025

Debtor
J & B Food Services, LLC
71 Liberty St
Hanson, MA 02341-1127
Represented By
Gary W. Cruickshank
Law Office Of Gary W. Cruickshank
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King - B
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Trustee
Mark G. DeGiacomo
Mark G. Degiacomo, Trustee Harris Beach Murtha Cullina PLLC 33 Arch Street, 12th Floor
Boston, MA 02110


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 12:03 AM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
crditcrd none Mon 04/28 1:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-10844 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A20936906, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/28 1:43 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals with corporate votes Filing Fee in the Amount of $338 Filed by J & B Food Services, LLC. (Cruickshank, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Electronic Filing
2 2 misc Statement Mon 04/28 1:44 PM
Statement of Federal Tax Identification Number filed by Debtor J & B Food Services, LLC (Cruickshank, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Electronic Filing
3 3 court|misc Matrix|Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix Mon 04/28 1:46 PM
Matrix, Verification of Creditor Matrix filed by Debtor J & B Food Services, LLC (Cruickshank, Gary)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Update Mon 04/28 2:45 PM
Order to Update Related [+] Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/12/2025. Schedules A-H due 5/12/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/12/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/12/2025. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122A-1 Due: 5/12/2025. Statement of Intent due 5/28/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2025 and 5/28/2025. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors 7b(Assets) (Use For Auto Assign Only) Mon 04/28 4:04 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee DeGiacomo, Mark G. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/3/2025 at 11:00 AM as a Zoom - DeGiacomo: Zoom.us/join, Meeting ID 314 308 5012, Passcode 4451083823, Phone 1-781-757-3255. Proofs of Claims due by 7/7/2025. Government Proofs of Claims due by 10/27/2025. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]