New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan S Trust
Case #: 8:25-bk-71653
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 09, 2025

Debtor
Four Strikes Inc
70 W Main St
East Islip, NY 11730-2323
Represented By
Four Strikes Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Kenneth P Silverman
RIMON P. C. Kenneth Silverman, Chapter 7 Trustee 100 Jericho Quadrangle, #300
Jericho, NY 11753
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 12:03 AM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Mon 04/28 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00. Receipt Number 80273864. (YR) (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/28 1:42 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by Four Strikes Inc (ylr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Mon 04/28 1:43 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Silverman, Kenneth P, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 6/9/2025 at 03:00 PM at Zoom.us/join - Silverman: Meeting ID 765 120 6494, Passcode 3289807015, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Mon 04/28 1:47 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/28/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/28/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/28/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/12/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/12/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/12/2025. Schedule G due 5/12/2025. Schedule H due 5/12/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/12/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2025. (ylr)
Related: [-]