North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lena M James
Case #: 6:25-bk-50284
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Carolina's Contracting, LLC
PO Box 964
Granite Quarry, NC 28072-0964
Represented By
Dirk W. Siegmund
Ivey, Mcclellan, Siegmund, Brumbaugh & Mcdonough, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Administrator
John Paul Hughes Cournoyer
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Chapter 11 Operating Order
19 19 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 3:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John C. Bircher III Filed by Attorney John Charles Bircher III. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Supplement to Certificate of Service - Certified Mail Receipt Wed 04/30 3:49 PM
Supplement to Certificate of Service - Certified Mail Receipt FedEx Receipt Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC Related [+]. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-] 10 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 misc Designation of Depository Tue 04/29 1:56 PM
Amended Designation of Depository: First Citizens Bank, 18 Lake Concord Rd. NE, Concord, NC 28025. (Whitesell, S.)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Document (Generic) Tue 04/29 1:47 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Officers. Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Objection Tue 04/29 12:11 PM
Limited Objection to Related [+] Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John Paul Hughes Cournoyer (Cournoyer, John Paul)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and the Granting of Adequate Protection filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC
14 14 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 04/29 11:33 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at (WS-11) Zoom Meeting, https://www.ncmba.uscourts.gov/zoom341s. Proofs of Claims due by 8/20/2025. (Whitesell, S.)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Designating Party to Act on behalf of Corp/Partnership Tue 04/29 11:14 AM
Order Designating Louis Keyo Matthews, Sr., the Member/Manager of Debtor to Act on behalf of Corporation. (Whitesell, S.)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Designation of Depository Tue 04/29 11:10 AM
Designation of Depository: South State Bank (Salisbury Branch), 401 W. Innes St., Salisbury, NC 28144. (Whitesell, S.)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Notice of Tentative Hearing 21 Tue 04/29 10:41 AM
Notice of Tentative Hearing . Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Application to Employ Dirk Siegmund and the law firm of Ivey, McClellan, Siegmund, Brumbaugh & McDonough, LLP as Debtors Attorney. Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. Objections are due 5/22/2025. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 5/29/2025 at 02:00 PM Courtroom, Winston-Salem for9 , (Whitesell, S.
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 9:34 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC Related [+]. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and the Granting of Adequate Protection ,5 Motion to Reduce Notice (related documents4 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) ,8 Order on Motion to Reduce Notice
9 9 motion Employ Tue 04/29 8:25 AM
Application to Employ Dirk Siegmund and the law firm of Ivey, McClellan, Siegmund, Brumbaugh & McDonough, LLP as Debtors Attorney Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 order Reduce Notice Mon 04/28 5:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Reduce Notice Related [+] Hearing Scheduled 5/1/25 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and the Granting of Adequate Protection Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC.
7 7 order Chapter 11 Operating Order Mon 04/28 4:59 PM
Chapter 11 Operating Order. (Shoffner, T.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Memo to DIP Attorney re: Duties Mon 04/28 4:50 PM
Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties (Shoffner, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
5 5 motion Reduce Notice Mon 04/28 3:58 PM
Motion to Reduce Notice Related [+] Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Use Cash Collateral
4 4 22 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Mon 04/28 3:55 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and the Granting of Adequate Protection Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Mon 04/28 3:49 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document (Generic) Mon 04/28 3:48 PM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition. Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC. (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-]
1 1 137 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/28 3:39 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Carolina's Contracting, LLC (Siegmund, Dirk)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/28 3:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-50284 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number B10812802, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Hearing Set (No BNC Notice) Mon 04/28 5:01 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and the Granting of Adequate Protection Filed by Debtor Carolina's Contracting, LLC.