Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Ch Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-21932
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:12 AM EDT
Defendant
MANOLO BLAHNIK AMERICAS LLC
Registered office c/o C T Corporation System 28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Plaintiff
Aishia Petersen
3557 N. Lake Mann Dr.
Orlando, FL 32805
Represented By
Acacia Regina Silva Barros
Acacia Barros, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/02 10:45 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 04/29 2:05 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES IN ADA CASES. Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to MANOLO BLAHNIK AMERICAS LLC. (blc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 04/29 9:50 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 7:15 PM
COMPLAINT for PERMANENT INJUCTIVE RELIEF against MANOLO BLAHNIK AMERICAS LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18405006, filed by Aishia Petersen.(Barros, Acacia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit