Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:25-cv-02303
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC
Plaintiff
Eric Adams
1650 Anderson Mill Rd Apt 14204
Austell, GA 30106


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 05/07 9:45 AM
Return of Service Executed by Eric Adams. Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC served on 5/2/2025, answer due 5/23/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 order Notice to Pro Se Parties Tue 04/29 9:17 AM
NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 04/29/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/29 9:19 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Adams re3 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 12:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100018818) filed by Eric Adams.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet