Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:25-cv-02351
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Brooklyn Battle
and All Other Occupants 934 Garden Walk Boulevard Apt. 804
Atlanta, GA 30349
Plaintiff
OREI Garden Walk Property Owner LLC
Represented By
Richard Coles Taylor
Law Office Of Richard C. Taylor, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 8:30 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brooklyn Battle, OREI Garden Walk Property Owner LLC re5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Brooklyn Battle,6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Thu 05/01 8:29 AM
ORDER for Service of5 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/30/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Thu 05/01 8:26 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal filed by Brooklyn Battle. The Court RECOMMENDS that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/30/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 1:49 PM
ORDER: Defendant's request for preliminary relief is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to return this matter to the Magistrate Judge for a frivolity review. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/30/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/30 1:50 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brooklyn Battle, OREI Garden Walk Property Owner LLC re4 Order. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 1:52 PM
Submission of2 Notice of Removal for frivolity review to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 4 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 1:41 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge and SUBMIT this case to the District Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/28/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Emergency Motion to Stay Writ of Possession with COMPLAINT filed by Brooklyn Battle.(gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 11:44 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brooklyn Battle.(gww) Modified on 4/28/2025 (gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal with Emergency Motion to Stay Writ of Possession,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 11:55 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/28 1:42 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brooklyn Battle, OREI Garden Walk Property Owner LLC re3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 04/28 1:43 PM
Submission of2 Notice of Removal with Emergency Motion to Stay Writ of Possession for frivolity determination to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (gww)
Related: [-]