Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:25-cv-02352
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Rachel Forts
and all other occupants 4538 Rowland North Drive
Stone Mountain, GA 30083
Plaintiff
Lopes Holdings USA LLC
Represented By
Robert Maceo Ayorinde Dukes
Rma Dukes Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Tue 04/29 4:17 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Order and Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 04/29/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Tue 04/29 4:16 PM
ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting Defendant's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis1 and recommending that this action be remanded to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 04/29/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/29 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Rachel Forts.(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/29 4:18 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rachel Forts re3 Order and Final Report and Recommendation,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 3:53 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rachel Forts.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 3:54 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, for ifp determination, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (tas)
Related: [-]