Patrick Little v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02412 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Securities Americas
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company LTD
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Respirator Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corp Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Little
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/28 3:42 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/21/2025), Patrick Little v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02412-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District Court of North Carolina (wmil, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, ) |
|
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12343654.), filed by Patrick Little. Service due by 6/20/2025(wmil, ) |