Theodore M. Lausser Jr. v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02516 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont de Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Plaintiff
Theodore M. Lausser Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/28 11:50 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(Associated as of 3/24/2025), Theodore M. Lausser Jr. v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02516-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (moor) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (moor) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12345380.), filed by Theodore M. Lausser Jr.. Service due by 7/28/2025(moor) |