Richard Orona v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02533 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Company Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Orona
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/28 3:59 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 03/24/2025), Richard Orona v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02533-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern District of Georgia (jdal) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jdal) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12345631.), filed by Richard Orona. Service due by 6/23/2025 (jdal) |