Louisiana Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael A Crawford
Case #: 3:25-bk-10353
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Wyndston Millwork, LLC
8900 Bluebonnet Blvd
Baton Rouge, LA 70810-2813
Represented By
Ryan James Richmond
Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
600 S. Maestri Place Suite 840-T
New Orleans, LA 70130


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 05/07 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. RE: related document(s)19 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC RE: related document(s)28 Notice filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice Tue 05/06 12:07 PM
Amended Notice of Claims Bar Dates Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC (Richmond, Ryan). Related document(s)16 Notice filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. Modified on 5/6/2025 (scha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
27 27 misc Document Mon 05/05 4:48 PM
Written Consent to File Subchapter V Petition Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sat 05/03 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)20 Order on Motion Re:Chapter 11 First Day Motions. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/03 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. RE: related document(s)19 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 05/01 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)15 Order on Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Application to Employ. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 05/01 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)14 Order on Motion To Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 05/01 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)12 Scheduling Status Conference Chapter 11 Subchapter V. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency Thu 05/01 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency RE: related document(s)11 Notice of Deficiency for Missing Signature - form. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Thu 05/01 1:50 PM
Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Schedules and Statements Related [+] Filed on 5/1/2025. Incomplete Filings due: 5/20/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 8
19 19 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Thu 05/01 10:07 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference. Proofs of Claims due by 7/7/2025. (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 trustee Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee Wed 04/30 4:21 PM
Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee by U.S. Trustee SubchapterV. The appointment is in accordance with 11 U.S.C. Section 1104 and is pursuant to the authority vested in the U.S. Trustee by 28 U.S.C. Section 586 . Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee.(Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 12:47 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC RE: related document(s)12 Scheduling Status Conference Chapter 11 Subchapter V,14 Order on Motion To Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim,15 Order on Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Application to Employ,16 Notice filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice Tue 04/29 11:46 AM
Notice of Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Application to Employ Tue 04/29 11:33 AM
Interim Order Granting Application to Employ Ryan J. Richmond and the law firm of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC as Counsel for Debtor-in-Possession Related [+] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final hearing on the Application will be held on Wednesday, May 28, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. Filed on 4/29/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 6
14 14 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Tue 04/29 11:16 AM
Order Granting Motion To Set Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Related [+] Filed on 4/29/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/8/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/27/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 7
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 10:27 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC RE: related document(s)6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Application to Employ filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC,7 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC,8 Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Status Conference Chapter 11 Subchapter V Tue 04/29 10:22 AM
Order setting status conference Chapter 11 Subchapter V Filed on 4/29/2025. Status conference to be held on 6/11/2025 at 02:00 PM at 707 Florida St., Rm. 222. Pre-Status Report due by 5/28/2025. (scha)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Notice of Deficiency for Missing Signature - form Tue 04/29 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The related document is missing required signatures: **SIGNATURES ON CORPORATE RESOLUTION DO NOT CONFORM TO LR 1008-1(a)** Please file the signed document. Failure to correct this error within 7 days will result in the court striking the document without further notice from the court. RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. Document(s) due by 5/6/2025. (scha)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 8:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christy Renee Bergeron of DOJ-Ust on behalf of U.S. Trustee RE: related document(s)9 Notice of Appearance filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/29 8:49 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christy Renee Bergeron Filed by Christy Renee Bergeron of DOJ-Ust on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
utility Update Other Deadlines Tue 04/29 10:18 AM
Deadlines Updated. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2025. (scha)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set(Motion) Tue 04/29 11:33 AM
Hearing Set RE: related document(s)6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Application to Employ filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. Hearing scheduled 5/28/2025 at 02:00 PM at 707 Florida St., Rm. 222. (scha)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Mon 04/28 4:24 PM
Ex Parte Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Mon 04/28 4:23 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Application to Employ Mon 04/28 4:22 PM
Ex Parte Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Application to Employ Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC as Attorneys Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 04/28 4:10 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 04/28 4:01 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 04/28 3:58 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/28 3:51 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Corporate Resolution. Filed by Wyndston Millwork, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 7/28/2025. (Richmond, Ryan)Modified on 4/29/2025 (scha)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/28 3:51 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10353 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A4479615, in the Amount of $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2) Mon 04/28 3:53 PM
Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2) Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of Wyndston Millwork, LLC RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Wyndston Millwork, LLC. (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]