Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Jerry Edwards, Jr
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00542
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:10th JDC - Natchitoches Parish, C15418
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 10:01 PM CDT
Defendant
Jeff Landry
Defendant
State of Louisiana
Plaintiff
Chad Everett Jones
465170 David Wade Correctional Center 670 Bell Hill Rd
Homer, LA 71040


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Tue 04/29 8:29 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/29/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ChadEverett Jones. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/21/2025.(crt,Breite, S) (Devillier, W).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Att: 2 (4/28/2025) Proposed order
1 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Chad Everett Jones.(crt,Breite, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibits,
Att: 3 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/28 9:17 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]