Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Referred: Rebecca Rutherford
Case #: 3:25-cv-01032
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 2:05 AM CDT
Defendant
Galen College of Nursing
Plaintiff
Brittany Ebikeme
1846 Indigo Lane
Heartland, TX 75126


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/09 10:29 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri May 9 10:29:53 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 05/09 10:27 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court should DENY Ebikeme's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.4 ) and dismiss her case without prejudice unless she pays the $405.00 filing fee within thirty days of an order accepting this recommendation or by some other deadline established by the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/8/2025) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/28 9:30 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Apr 28 09:30:39 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 9:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brittany Ebikeme. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Galen College of Nursing filed by Brittany Ebikeme. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 04/28 9:26 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Godbey Mon 04/28 9:23 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]