California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:25-bk-11115
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 11, 2025

Debtor
A and K BILLING LLC
550 N Golden Circle Dr
Santa Ana, CA 92705-3959
Represented By
Roya Rohani
Law Office Of Roya Rohani
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeffrey I Golden (TR)
Golden Goodrich LLP 3070 Bristol Street, Suite 640
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/28 6:58 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-11115] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58348201. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/28 6:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by A and K BILLING LLC (Rohani, Roya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule Corp Ownership Statement
Att: 2 Schedule Corp Resolution
Att: 3 Schedule Statement of Related Cases
Att: 4 Schedule Summary of Schedules
Att: 5 Schedule 206A/B
Att: 6 206D
Att: 7 206E/F
Att: 8 206G
Att: 9 206H
Att: 10 Schedule 202
Att: 11 Schedule 207
Att: 12 Form2030
Att: 13 F-2090
Att: 14 Verification of Mailing List
Att: 15 Master Mailing List
2 2 misc Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Mon 04/28 7:01 PM
Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Filed by Debtor A and K BILLING LLC. (Rohani, Roya)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/28 7:02 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor A and K BILLING LLC. (Rohani, Roya)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Mon 04/28 7:03 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor A and K BILLING LLC. (Rohani, Roya)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Mon 04/28 7:04 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor A and K BILLING LLC. (Rohani, Roya)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1) Mon 04/28 7:05 PM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor A and K BILLING LLC. (Rohani, Roya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Master Mailing List
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 04/28 7:36 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Golden (TR), Jeffrey I with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/11/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Golden: Meeting ID 227 931 0235, Passcode 0647511609, Phone 1 657 222 4074. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]