Arizona District Court
Judge:Eileen S Willett
Case #: 2:25-cv-01401
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:12 AM MST
Defendant
Atlatl Group LLC
Defendant
Bravada Yachts LLC
Defendant
Aaron Browning
Defendant
Unknown Browning
Defendant
Martha Gutierrez
Defendant
Robert Gutierrez
Defendant
Havasu Penthouse C1 LLC
Defendant
Riviera Penthouses LLC
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
FUGA LLC
Represented By
Michael W Zimmerman
Berry Riddell LLC
contact info
Jeffrey D Gross
Berry Riddell LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 6:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Aaron Browning, Unknown Browning, Martha Gutierrez, Robert Gutierrez. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 04/29 1:02 PM
*SUMMONS Submitted Summons for Aaron Browning, Jane Doe Browning, Robert Gutierrez and Martha Gutierrez by Plaintiff FUGA LLC. (Zimmerman, Michael) *Modified to correct event on 4/29/2025 (MAP)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 04/29 12:58 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint Civil Coversheet by Plaintiff FUGA LLC. (Zimmerman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by FUGA LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. The submitted form is not used by the District of Arizona. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:3 Summons Submitted filed by FUGA LLC. The submitted forms for Aaron Browning and Jane Doe Browning as well as the form for Robert Gutierrez and Martha Gutierrez cannot be issued because multiple parties are listed on the same form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit four separate forms to be issued using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 12:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Atlatl Group LLC, Bravada Yachts LLC, Havasu Penthouse C1 LLC, Riviera Penthouses LLC.(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Mon 04/28 1:10 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by FUGA LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. The submitted form is not used by the District of Arizona. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:3 Summons Submitted filed by FUGA LLC. The submitted forms for Aaron Browning and Jane Doe Browning as well as the form for Robert Gutierrez and Martha Gutierrez cannot be issued because multiple parties are listed on the same form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit four separate forms to be issued using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 misc New Case Opened Mon 04/28 12:42 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24225836. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01401 PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
3 3 service Summons Submitted Mon 04/28 12:41 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by FUGA LLC. (submitted by Michael Zimmerman)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 12:39 PM
Disclosure Statement by FUGA LLC. (submitted by Michael Zimmerman) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 66 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24225836 filed by FUGA LLC. (submitted by Michael Zimmerman)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet