Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:25-cv-01407
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:13 AM MST
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
John Kristian Wittwer
Cavanagh Law Firm PA
contact info
Sydney M Lewin
Cavanagh Law Firm PA
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Wilson
Represented By
Mohamad Tokko
Sweet James LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 misc New Case Opened Mon 04/28 3:32 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24228358. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01407 PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 3:27 PM
Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (submitted by John Wittwer) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2025-010341. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24228358 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (submitted by John Wittwer)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-H,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
service Service Executed Mon 04/28 3:30 PM
***State Court record received on 4/25/2025***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gwendolyn Wilson: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company via Director of Insurance on 3/28/2025.***Declaration of Service filed in State Court on 4/01/2025, docketed in U.S. District Court on 4/25/2025 for case management purposes.*** (REK)
Related: [-]