California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:25-cv-03587
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax
Defendant
Experian
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Defendant
Spruce Power 2 LLC
Plaintiff
Kyle Perez
4015 Peoria Avenue
Simi Valley, CA 93063


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/28 10:03 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/28 10:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/28 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 10:00 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Equifax. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 9:59 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Experian. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 9:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Goldman Sachs Bank USA. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 9:56 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Spruce Power 2 LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/28 9:53 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kyle Perez, (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/28 9:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Equifax, Experian, Goldman Sachs Bank USA, Spruce Power 2 LLC.Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin., filed by Plaintiff Kyle Perez. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet