California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-03659
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 25CV461147
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 8:02 PM PDT
Defendant
Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership
Represented By
Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Diba Debbie Rastegar
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Debra Ellwood Meppen
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tita Peralta
Represented By
Nicolas Maxence Jupillat
Ilg Legal Office, P.C.
contact info
Stephen Noel Ilg
Ilg Legal Office, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 04/29 2:06 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 04/29 8:05 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/28 8:37 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our districts most current version (12/2024) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 25CV461147. (Filing fee $405, receipt number ACANDC-20612153). Filed by Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership. (Suarez, Jeanette) M
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeanette Suarez,
Att: 2 Affidavit Certification of Interested Parties,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Tue 04/29 1:57 PM
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No.1 -exhibit B) by Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]