McGOWANS v. SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 0:25-cv-60823 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap) |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICT
3501 JOHNSON STREET
HOLLYWOOD, FL 33021 |
|
Plaintiff
JOHANN McGOWANS
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Tue 04/29 7:07 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $405.00, receipt #AFLSDC-18405173, case filed date: 4/28/2025. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb) |