Original Case: 4:23-cv-04143

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01717
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
MIKE THOMS, Mayor of Rock Island and Local Liquor Commissioner
Represented By
Leslie Marie Day
OFFICE OF THE ROCK ISLAND COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID E. MORRISON, City of Rock Island
Represented By
Joseph N. Van Vooren
MITVALSKY VANVOOREN & FOX P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HECTOR L. LAREAU, City Attorney of Rock Island
Represented By
Joseph N. Van Vooren
MITVALSKY VANVOOREN & FOX P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD LANDI, Chief of Police Rock Island Police Department
Represented By
Leslie Marie Day
OFFICE OF THE ROCK ISLAND COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHELLE L. VEASEY, Playmakers Sport Bar and Grill LLC
Represented By
Michelle L. Veasey
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 3:15 AM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 05/12/2025. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michelle L. Veasey by 05/02/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Michelle L. Veasey. [1] [7449025] 25-1717 (AD) [Entered: 04/28/2025 12:23 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 42 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 1 pgs ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7449028] JKX [2] [7449028] 25-1717 (AD) [Entered: 04/28/2025 12:31 PM]
Related: [-]