Original Case: 4:23-cv-04143

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01718
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
MIKE THOMS, Mayor of Rock Island and Local Liquor Commissioner
Represented By
Leslie Marie Day
OFFICE OF THE ROCK ISLAND COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID E. MORRISON, City of Rock Island
Represented By
Joseph N. Van Vooren
MITVALSKY VANVOOREN & FOX P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HECTOR L. LAREAU, City Attorney of Rock Island
Represented By
Joseph N. Van Vooren
MITVALSKY VANVOOREN & FOX P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD LANDI, Chief of Police Rock Island Police Department
Represented By
Leslie Marie Day
OFFICE OF THE ROCK ISLAND COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHELLE L. VEASEY, Playmakers Sport Bar and Grill LLC
Represented By
Michelle L. Veasey
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 3:16 AM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 05/12/2025. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michelle L. Veasey by 05/02/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Michelle L. Veasey. [1] [7449032] 25-1718 (AD) [Entered: 04/28/2025 12:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 39 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 1 pgs ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7449036] JXK [2] [7449036] 25-1718 (AD) [Entered: 04/28/2025 12:46 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record suggests that this appeal duplicates an appeal also filed on April 25, 2025, and docketed in this court as Appeal No. 25-1717 Only one appeal is necessary, and the other should be dismissed. Harris v. Bellin Mem?l Hosp., 13 F.3d 1082, 1083 (7th Cir. 1994). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall file, on or before May 12, 2025, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary. A motion for voluntary dismissal under Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. JXK [7449065][3] [3] [7449065] 25-1718 (JMB) [Entered: 04/28/2025 02:22 PM]
Related: [-]