Original Case: 1:23-cv-01364

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-07063
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Priority Life Care, LLC
Represented By
James Joseph Murphy
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gina Latture
Represented By
David A. Branch
Law Office of David A. Branch and Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 4:16 AM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-7063
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2113280] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-01364-TJK filed by Gina Latture. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-7063 25-7063
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2113283] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/12/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/28/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/28/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/28/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/12/2025 25-7063
Related: [-]