Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cathy Bissoon
Case #: 2:25-cv-00578
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:24-cv-06734
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 8:05 AM EDT
Defendant
WALMART INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL J. KINCADE, JR.
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Chelsea L. Hollenstein
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Malayna Rankin
Represented By
Erik M. Yurkovich
The Workers' Rights Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (for Clerk of Court Personnel Only) Tue 04/29 7:54 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:24-cv-06734. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/29 9:56 AM
Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TRANSFER VENUE (ECF NO. 9) AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (ECF NOS. 10 AND 11), IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION (ECF NO. 9) IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT IT SEEKS TRANSFER AND DENIED TO THE EXTENT IT SEEKS DISMISSAL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/6/2025 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 4 pgs Memorandum in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Walmart Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint For Improper Venue, And Alternatively, Transfer Venue filed by Malayna Rankin. (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
10 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Walmart Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint For Improper Venue, And Alternatively, Transfer Venue filed by Malayna Rankin.(Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Walmart Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint For Improper Venue, And Alternatively, Transfer Venue filed by WALMART, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(Hollenstein, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea L. Hollenstein on behalf of WALMART, INC. with Certificate of Service(Hollenstein, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
7 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before January 31, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/2/25. 1/2/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
6 6 STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney), by WALMART, INC.. (KINCADE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. KINCADE, JR on behalf of WALMART, INC. with Certificate of Service(KINCADE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malayna Rankin re: Joseph Wilson-Arena served Summons and Complaint upon WALMART, INC. by Personal. WALMART, INC. served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
3 3 Summons Issued as to WALMART, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/19/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
2 2 NOTICE by Malayna Rankin re1 Complaint (Attorney), (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT in Civil Action against WALMART, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17954731.), filed by Malayna Rankin.(Yurkovich, Erik) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/18/2024) (sbt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/18/2024) (sbt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]