South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph F Anderson, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-03517
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Zaldivar Underground LLC
Plaintiff
Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By
Carl David Hiller
Hhp Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Zaldivar Underground LLC. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Tue 04/29 10:56 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/29 10:55 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Zaldivar Underground LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12418491.), filed by Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC. Service due by 7/28/2025(jpet, )
Related: [-]