New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:25-bk-14409
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PPS Property 1213-1215 Putnam Ave. LLC
801 E. 6th Street
Plainfield, NJ 07062
Represented By
Robert C. Nisenson
Robert C. Nisenson, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:26 PM EDT
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 2 pgs motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Tue 05/06 12:51 PM
Motion re: Motion to Continue Stay Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPS Property 1213-1215 Putnam Ave. LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.. (Nisenson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
5 5 3 pgs motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Tue 05/06 12:13 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Robert C. Nisenson as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPS Property 1213-1215 Putnam Ave. LLC. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Nisenson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Mon 05/05 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPS Property 1213-1215 Putnam Ave. LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/27/2025. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/03 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 04/30 8:43 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/4/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 7/8/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/27/2025. (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/30 7:37 AM
Remark: Debtor Has Prior Filing 25-10171 (rah)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 04/30 12:03 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-14409 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48092824, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/29 11:43 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPS Property 1213-1215 Putnam Ave. LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/27/2025. (Nisenson, Robert)
Related: [-]