Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:25-cv-01763
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 11:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Karla Moran
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
Connie Nolan
Defendant
Kika Scott
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Defendant
Trina Swanson
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Plaintiff
Fahma Mohamed Abdi
Represented By
Kelsey Hines
Hines Immigration Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Abtidon Abdi Gure
Represented By
Kelsey Hines
Hines Immigration Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 10:50 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 Summons Issued as to Karla Moran, Kristi Noem, Connie Nolan, Kika Scott, Trina Swanson. (LTT)
Related: [-]
2 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 25-cv-1763 PJS/LIB. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11852072) filed by Fahma Mohamed Abdi and Abtidon Abdi Gure. Filer requests summons issued. (Hines, Kelsey) Modified text on 4/29/2025 (LTT).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet