Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:25-cv-02464
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Case in other court:Shelby County Circuit Court, CT-91-00025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 11:08 AM CDT
Defendant
SCOTT GUNNISON
Defendant
THOMAS HENRY GUNNISON
Represented By
Mary Beth Haltom White
Lewis Thomason, P.C.
contact info
Miscellaneous
Temiika Gipson
Circuit Court, 30th Judicial District Shelby County Courthouse 140 Adams Ave, Rm 224
Memphis, TN 38103
Plaintiff
JAHMIL DAVIS
Represented By
Charles Silvestri Higgins
Nahon, Saharovich & Trotz, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/05 3:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/5/2025. (shl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/02 1:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by SCOTT GUNNISON, THOMAS HENRY GUNNISON. (Sullivan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 2:45 PM
NOTICE by THOMAS HENRY GUNNISON NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLETE COPY OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT(White, Mary Beth Haltom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 1:38 PM
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE COMPLETE COPY OF STATE COURT PLEADINGS. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/30/2025. (shl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form (form AO 85) is available on the US Courts website at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms-rules/forms. (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 04/29 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Tue 04/29 11:07 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/29 11:06 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/29 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS HENRY GUNNISON from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0391-25 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4676906), filed by THOMAS HENRY GUNNISON.(White, Mary Beth Haltom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Notice of Filing